California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB829 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill April 26, 2012

Amended

Bill April 9, 2012
Bill March 14, 2012
Bill February 23, 2012
Bill July 1, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill May 3, 2011
Bill March 24, 2011