|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2152.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 2591.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 18.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 886.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 763.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|