LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB847
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB847
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB847
Compare Versions
SB847 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB847 Amended August 23, 2011
SB847 Amended May 10, 2011
SB847 Amended April 25, 2011
SB847 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB847 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB847 Amended August 23, 2011
SB847 Amended May 10, 2011
SB847 Amended April 25, 2011
SB847 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare