|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 539, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2237.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 2176.)
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2079.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2588.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1138.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 951.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|