LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB857
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB857
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB857
Compare Versions
SB857 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB857 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB857 Amended July 7, 2011
SB857 Amended June 13, 2011
SB857 Amended April 25, 2011
SB857 Amended March 24, 2011
SB857 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB857 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB857 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB857 Amended July 7, 2011
SB857 Amended June 13, 2011
SB857 Amended April 25, 2011
SB857 Amended March 24, 2011
SB857 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare