|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 346, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2245.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 21. Page 2739.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1265.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1123.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 861.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 621.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|