LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB859
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB859
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB859
Compare Versions
SB859 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB859 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB859 Amended August 23, 2011
SB859 Amended July 5, 2011
SB859 Amended May 31, 2011
SB859 Amended May 10, 2011
SB859 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB859 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB859 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB859 Amended August 23, 2011
SB859 Amended July 5, 2011
SB859 Amended May 31, 2011
SB859 Amended May 10, 2011
SB859 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare