LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB863
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB863
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB863
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 18, 2011
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 7, 2012
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 19, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 30, 2012
Compare
Bill
August 27, 2012
Compare
Bill
August 24, 2012
Compare
Bill
June 6, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 14, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 22, 2011
Compare