LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB863
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB863
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB863
Compare Versions
SB863 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB863 Enrolled September 7, 2012
SB863 Amended August 30, 2012
SB863 Amended August 27, 2012
SB863 Amended August 24, 2012
SB863 Amended June 6, 2011
SB863 Amended April 14, 2011
SB863 Amended March 22, 2011
SB863 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB863 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB863 Enrolled September 7, 2012
SB863 Amended August 30, 2012
SB863 Amended August 27, 2012
SB863 Amended August 24, 2012
SB863 Amended June 6, 2011
SB863 Amended April 14, 2011
SB863 Amended March 22, 2011
SB863 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare