|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2417.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2992.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2770.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1036.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 737.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|