LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB869
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB869
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB869
Compare Versions
SB869 Chaptered October 2, 2011
SB869 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB869 Amended September 1, 2011
SB869 Amended July 11, 2011
SB869 Amended June 20, 2011
SB869 Amended June 1, 2011
SB869 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB869 Chaptered October 2, 2011
SB869 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB869 Amended September 1, 2011
SB869 Amended July 11, 2011
SB869 Amended June 20, 2011
SB869 Amended June 1, 2011
SB869 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare