|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 5964.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2733.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2639.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
12/21/2011
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|