California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB874 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill March 21, 2011