|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 380, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4776.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6123.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6003.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2680.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2622.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|