LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB875
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB875
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB875
Compare Versions
SB875 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB875 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB875 Amended August 20, 2012
SB875 Amended August 6, 2012
SB875 Amended June 6, 2012
SB875 Amended May 25, 2012
SB875 Amended January 4, 2012
SB875 Amended March 25, 2011
SB875 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB875 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB875 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB875 Amended August 20, 2012
SB875 Amended August 6, 2012
SB875 Amended June 6, 2012
SB875 Amended May 25, 2012
SB875 Amended January 4, 2012
SB875 Amended March 25, 2011
SB875 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare