|
09/30/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5082.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Set for hearing August 30. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5043.)
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4923.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6345.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6088.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5520.)
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2686.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 2641.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2011
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|