California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB878 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 9, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill June 4, 2012
Bill June 9, 2011