|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 523, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2417.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2993.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2775.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1188.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 858.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|