California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB879 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill May 11, 2011