|
09/26/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6194.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 761.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|