California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB885 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/30/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 885ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 27, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 7, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 24, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Simitian FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Sections 10801 and 10807 of the Education Code, relating to public education accountability. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 885, Simitian. Public education accountability: longitudinal education data system. Existing law establishes a system of public education in this state. This system includes public elementary and secondary schools, which provide instruction to pupils from preschool through grade 12, as well as the institutions that comprise the 3 segments of higher education, which are the California Community Colleges, the California State University, and the University of California. Existing law expresses the intent of the Legislature that the design and implementation of a high-quality, comprehensive, and longitudinal education data system for California should meet specified goals. Existing law authorizes the State Department of Education, the University of California, the California State University, the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, the Commission on Teacher Credentialing, the Employment Development Department, and the California School Information Services to enter into interagency agreements to facilitate the implementation of a comprehensive longitudinal education data system for California, the transfer of data from one educational segment to another, and the transfer of workforce data to the educational segments. This bill would amend the expression of intent of the Legislature referenced above to state that the design and implementation of a high-quality, comprehensive, and longitudinal preschool through higher education (P-20) statewide data system should meet specified goals. The bill would also authorize the State Board of Education, in addition to the entities referenced above, to enter into a joint powers agreement, rather than interagency agreements, to facilitate the implementation of the comprehensive longitudinal preschool through higher education (P-20) statewide data system referenced by the bill. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 10801 of the Education Code is amended to read: 10801. It is the intent of the Legislature that the design and implementation of a high-quality, comprehensive, and longitudinal preschool through higher education (P-20) statewide data system for California will do the following: (a) Support a system of continuous learning by delivering timely, reliable, user-friendly, and relevant information to schoolsite and district leaders, county offices of education, higher education leaders, teachers and faculty, education program providers, policymakers, researchers, parents, pupils, and the public at large. (b) Provide educators and parents with the tools, reports, and assistance needed to inform instruction and learning. (c) Integrate data from disparate sources. (d) Anticipate and provide the technological capacity for the sharing of appropriate noneducation data from other state sources such as health, welfare, juvenile justice, corrections, and employment agencies, the analysis of which is necessary to fully understand critical education policy and education finance questions. SEC. 2. Section 10807 of the Education Code is amended to read: 10807. The department, the University of California, the California State University, the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, the Commission on Teacher Credentialing, the state board, the Employment Development Department, and the California School Information Services established in Section 49081 may enter into a joint powers agreement pursuant to Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 6500) of Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code in order to facilitate all of the following: (a) The implementation of a comprehensive longitudinal preschool through higher education (P-20) statewide data system for California. (b) The transfer of data from one educational segment to another. (c) The transfer of workforce data to the educational segments.