08/13/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/23/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/16/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/16/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 981.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/10/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 859.) (May 4). | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |