LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB911
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB911
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB911
Compare Versions
SB911 Amended August 9, 2012
SB911 Amended May 10, 2011
SB911 Amended April 26, 2011
SB911 Amended April 4, 2011
SB911 Amended March 22, 2011
SB911 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB911 Amended August 9, 2012
SB911 Amended May 10, 2011
SB911 Amended April 26, 2011
SB911 Amended April 4, 2011
SB911 Amended March 22, 2011
SB911 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare