California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB913 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill June 27, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011