LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB913
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB913
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB913
Compare Versions
SB913 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB913 Enrolled August 23, 2011
SB913 Amended June 27, 2011
SB913 Amended April 14, 2011
SB913 Amended March 29, 2011
SB913 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB913 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB913 Enrolled August 23, 2011
SB913 Amended June 27, 2011
SB913 Amended April 14, 2011
SB913 Amended March 29, 2011
SB913 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare