|
07/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 23. Page 2266.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1140.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 621.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|