LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB917
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB917
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB917
Compare Versions
SB917 Chaptered July 26, 2011
SB917 Enrolled July 12, 2011
SB917 Amended May 16, 2011
SB917 Amended April 27, 2011
SB917 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB917 Chaptered July 26, 2011
SB917 Enrolled July 12, 2011
SB917 Amended May 16, 2011
SB917 Amended April 27, 2011
SB917 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare