|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6337.) .
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 6273.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 6276.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2733.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(2) suspended. (Page 2714.) From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 849.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|