LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB924
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB924
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB924
Compare Versions
SB924 Amended August 24, 2012
SB924 Amended August 20, 2012
SB924 Amended June 18, 2012
SB924 Amended January 26, 2012
SB924 Amended May 24, 2011
SB924 Amended May 9, 2011
SB924 Amended March 30, 2011
SB924 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB924 Amended August 24, 2012
SB924 Amended August 20, 2012
SB924 Amended June 18, 2012
SB924 Amended January 26, 2012
SB924 Amended May 24, 2011
SB924 Amended May 9, 2011
SB924 Amended March 30, 2011
SB924 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare