|
09/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 3180.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3036.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (September 8).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (September 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2940.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2822.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2597.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1281.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 886.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 1.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|