LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB946
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB946
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB946
Compare Versions
SB946 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB946 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB946 Amended September 9, 2011
SB946 Amended September 6, 2011
SB946 Amended September 2, 2011
SB946 Enrolled August 26, 2011
SB946 Amended May 10, 2011
SB946 Introduced March 31, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB946 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB946 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB946 Amended September 9, 2011
SB946 Amended September 6, 2011
SB946 Amended September 2, 2011
SB946 Enrolled August 26, 2011
SB946 Amended May 10, 2011
SB946 Introduced March 31, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare