California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB948 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 1, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill June 30, 2011
Bill June 7, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011