LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB948
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB948
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB948
Compare Versions
SB948 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB948 Enrolled September 8, 2011
SB948 Amended June 30, 2011
SB948 Amended June 7, 2011
SB948 Amended April 27, 2011
SB948 Introduced April 1, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB948 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB948 Enrolled September 8, 2011
SB948 Amended June 30, 2011
SB948 Amended June 7, 2011
SB948 Amended April 27, 2011
SB948 Introduced April 1, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare