|
09/29/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5010.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6452.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6252.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.)
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3737.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3588.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3309.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3204.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|