LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB956
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB956
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB956
Compare Versions
SB956 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB956 Amended August 24, 2012
SB956 Amended August 20, 2012
SB956 Amended August 6, 2012
SB956 Amended June 19, 2012
SB956 Amended May 21, 2012
SB956 Amended May 1, 2012
SB956 Amended April 9, 2012
SB956 Amended March 26, 2012
SB956 Introduced January 9, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB956 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB956 Amended August 24, 2012
SB956 Amended August 20, 2012
SB956 Amended August 6, 2012
SB956 Amended June 19, 2012
SB956 Amended May 21, 2012
SB956 Amended May 1, 2012
SB956 Amended April 9, 2012
SB956 Amended March 26, 2012
SB956 Introduced January 9, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare