|
08/16/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 3692.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3513.) (May 14).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3259.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|