LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB969
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB969
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB969
Compare Versions
SB969 Amended June 20, 2012
SB969 Amended May 23, 2012
SB969 Amended May 17, 2012
SB969 Amended April 26, 2012
SB969 Amended April 18, 2012
SB969 Amended April 9, 2012
SB969 Introduced January 17, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB969 Amended June 20, 2012
SB969 Amended May 23, 2012
SB969 Amended May 17, 2012
SB969 Amended April 26, 2012
SB969 Amended April 18, 2012
SB969 Amended April 9, 2012
SB969 Introduced January 17, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare