|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 3741.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3589.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3265.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|