LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB974
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB974
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB974
Compare Versions
SB974 Amended July 5, 2012
SB974 Amended May 29, 2012
SB974 Amended May 1, 2012
SB974 Amended April 11, 2012
SB974 Introduced January 19, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB974 Amended July 5, 2012
SB974 Amended May 29, 2012
SB974 Amended May 1, 2012
SB974 Amended April 11, 2012
SB974 Introduced January 19, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare