|
09/25/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 4962.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 7. Page 6333.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 3638.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3445.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|