LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB975
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB975
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB975
Compare Versions
SB975 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB975 Amended August 22, 2012
SB975 Amended June 27, 2012
SB975 Amended June 14, 2012
SB975 Amended May 14, 2012
SB975 Amended March 27, 2012
SB975 Introduced January 19, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB975 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB975 Amended August 22, 2012
SB975 Amended June 27, 2012
SB975 Amended June 14, 2012
SB975 Amended May 14, 2012
SB975 Amended March 27, 2012
SB975 Introduced January 19, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare