|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 328, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4781.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5845.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3290.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected June 7.)
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3118.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|