LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB976
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB976
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB976
Compare Versions
SB976 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB976 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB976 Amended July 5, 2012
SB976 Amended April 12, 2012
SB976 Introduced January 19, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB976 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB976 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB976 Amended July 5, 2012
SB976 Amended April 12, 2012
SB976 Introduced January 19, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare