|
08/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4466.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 5842.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 3219.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3119.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|