California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2012

Amended

Bill May 21, 2012
Bill March 8, 2012