08/06/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
07/03/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
07/03/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4200.) (June 28). | |||
06/28/2012 | Set for hearing June 28. | |||
06/20/2012 | Set for hearing June 27. | |||
02/16/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
02/15/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/09/2011 | Set for hearing February 23. | |||
01/20/2011 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. | |||
01/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |