LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA2
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCA2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA2
Compare Versions
SCA2 Amended August 6, 2012
SCA2 Amended July 5, 2012
SCA2 Amended February 15, 2011
SCA2 Amended January 10, 2011
SCA2 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SCA2 Amended August 6, 2012
SCA2 Amended July 5, 2012
SCA2 Amended February 15, 2011
SCA2 Amended January 10, 2011
SCA2 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare