07/14/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/14/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
07/11/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/06/2011 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
06/16/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
06/15/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1959.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/09/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |||
05/26/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/17/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected May 19.) | |||
04/28/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/21/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/21/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 394.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/07/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |