LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR20
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR20
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR20
Compare Versions
SCR20 Chaptered July 14, 2011
SCR20 Enrolled July 12, 2011
SCR20 Amended May 26, 2011
SCR20 Amended May 17, 2011
SCR20 Introduced March 7, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SCR20 Chaptered July 14, 2011
SCR20 Enrolled July 12, 2011
SCR20 Amended May 26, 2011
SCR20 Amended May 17, 2011
SCR20 Introduced March 7, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare