05/16/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/16/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
05/14/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3497.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
05/09/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4677.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/28/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/28/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/21/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |